Breadcrumb
Navigation Menu
Diputados
Personal file
Born on Mon Mar 19 00:00:00 CET 1956 in Valencia
Deputy of the VII, VIII, y IX Legislatures
Casado. Un hijo. Licenciado en Ciencias Económicas. Funcionario. Técnico Comercial y Economista de Estado.
Full condition: Wed Apr 05 00:00:00 CEST 2000
Caused inactivity Fri Apr 02 00:00:00 CEST 2004
Historical of charges
- Vocal Suplente Diputación Permanente from Wed Jun 21 00:00:00 CEST 2000 to Fri Dec 22 00:00:00 CET 2000
- Vocal Diputación Permanente from Fri Dec 22 00:00:00 CET 2000 to Fri Apr 02 00:00:00 CEST 2004
- Portavoz Comisión de Economía y Hacienda from Thu May 11 00:00:00 CEST 2000 to Tue Jan 20 00:00:00 CET 2004
- Vocal Comisión de Presupuestos from Wed May 10 00:00:00 CEST 2000 to Fri May 12 00:00:00 CEST 2000
- Adscrito Comisión de Infraestructuras from Wed May 24 00:00:00 CEST 2000 to Tue Jan 20 00:00:00 CET 2004
Parliamentary Initiatives
- Pregunta oral en Pleno.(180/000130) Presented on 22/06/2000 , qualified on 27/06/2000
- Pregunta oral en Pleno.(180/000161) Presented on 07/09/2000 , qualified on 12/09/2000
- Pregunta oral en Pleno.(180/000300) Presented on 16/10/2000 , qualified on 17/10/2000