Breadcrumb
Navigation Menu
Bodies of the house
Membership Actual
XI Legislatura (2016-2016)
Date of Constitution: Wed Mar 16 00:00:00 CET 2016
Entry Date | Leave Date | |
---|---|---|
Presidente | ||
Rojas García, Carlos (GP) | 16/03/2016 | 18/07/2016 |
Miembros | ||
Aragonés Mendiguchía, Carlos (SGPP) | 16/03/2016 | 17/03/2016 |
Bustinduy Amador, Pablo (GP-EC-EM) | 16/03/2016 | 18/07/2016 |
Gil García, Andrés (SGPS) | 16/03/2016 | 03/05/2016 |
Lozano Domingo, Irene (GS) | 16/03/2016 | 03/05/2016 |
Pérez Lapazarán, José Cruz (SGPP) | 16/03/2016 | 03/05/2016 |
Puche Rodríguez-Acosta, Gabino (SGPP) | 17/03/2016 | 18/07/2016 |
Letrada | ||
Sánchez-Abarca Gornals, Carmen | 18/07/2016 |