Ogi-apurra
Navigation Menu
Organoak
Osaera Actual
XIV Legislatura (2019-2023)
Eratze data: Thu Feb 13 00:00:00 CET 2020
Altaren data | Bajaren data | |
---|---|---|
Presidenta | ||
Botella Gómez, Ana María (GS) | 13/02/2020 | 16/08/2023 |
Miembros | ||
Barandiaran Benito, Íñigo (GV (EAJ-PNV)) | 17/12/2020 | 30/05/2023 |
Bueno Pinto, José Luis (GCUP-EC-GC) | 30/06/2022 | 18/07/2022 |
Delgado Ramos, Juan Antonio (GCUP-EC-GC) | 25/10/2021 | 27/06/2022 |
Esteban Bravo, Aitor (GV (EAJ-PNV)) | 13/02/2020 | 17/12/2020 |
Lemus Rubiales, Rafael Damián (SGPS) | 13/02/2020 | 16/08/2023 |
Muñoz Dalda, Lucía (GCUP-EC-GC) | 13/02/2020 | 25/10/2021 |
Muñoz Dalda, Lucía (GCUP-EC-GC) | 18/07/2022 | 16/08/2023 |
Pradas Ten, Salomé (SGPP) | 13/02/2020 | 16/08/2023 |
Sánchez Pérez, César (GP) | 13/02/2020 | 30/05/2023 |
Letrada | ||
Sánchez-Abarca Gornals, Carmen | 16/08/2023 |